Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Ingelby

Deceased

Bishop of Killala, Ireland

Auxiliary Bishop of London, England


Events

DateEventTitle
6 Feb 1471AppointedBishop of Killala, Ireland
23 Apr 1471Ordained BishopBishop of Killala, Ireland
1484²AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain
1489²AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of London, England, Great Britain
8 Jul 1499DiedBishop of Killala, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Thomas Ingelby
Bishop Thomas Ingelby (died ) Bishop of Killala

EventPlace
Ordained BishopHospice Anglais, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 28.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 83
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,515
  • d: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 209
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1471, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 6 Nov 2018

Quantcast