Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Hugh Inge, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Dublin, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
28 Jan 1512AppointedBishop of Meath, Ireland
27 Feb 1523AppointedArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland
3 Aug 1528DiedArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Hugh Inge
Archbishop Hugh Inge O.P. (died ) Archbishop of Dublin

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 188, and Page 243
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1512, Number 3*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 20 May 2018

Quantcast