Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andras József Illyés

Deceased

Bishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1646¹BornCsikszentgyörgy
1668¹22.0Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jan 169650.0SelectedBishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania
14 Jan 169751.0ConfirmedBishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania
3 Mar 169751.1Ordained BishopBishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania
20 Sep 171266.7DiedBishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andras József Illyés:
Bishop Andras József Illyés (born 1646, died ) Bishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen

  • a priest for 44.7 years
  • a bishop for 15.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 385
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Number 15,116
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1697, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 2 May 2015