Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard of Ilchester

Deceased

Bishop of Winchester, England


Events

DateEventTitle
1 May 1173AppointedBishop of Winchester, England, Great Britain
6 Oct 1174Ordained BishopBishop of Winchester, England, Great Britain
22 Dec 1188DiedBishop of Winchester, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Richard of Ilchester:
Bishop Richard of Ilchester (died ) Bishop of Winchester

  • a bishop for 14.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c23: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 49
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 9 Jan 2014