Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Johannes Damascus Jesacher (Iesacher), O.F.M. †

Deceased

Prefect of Lingling [Yungchow], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 May 1880Born
189615.6ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
190322.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
30 May 193151.0AppointedPrefect of Lingling [Yungchow], China
25 Jan 194766.6DiedPrefect of Lingling [Yungchow], China

MicroData Summary for Johannes Damascus Jesacher (Iesacher)
Father Johannes Damascus Jesacher (Iesacher) O.F.M. (born , died ) Prefect of Lingling [Yungchow]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAbsam, Diocese of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
Death PlaceYungchow, Prefecture Apostolic of Lingling [Yungchow]

  • a priest for 44.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 11 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast