Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diego Cardinal Hurtado de Mendoza y Quiñones

Deceased

Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina

Titular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1444Born
13 Feb 147026.1AppointedBishop of Palencia, Spain
29 Aug 148541.6AppointedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
20 Mar 150056.2Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
28 Sep 150056.7Elevated to Cardinal
5 Oct 150056.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina
5 Oct 150056.7AppointedTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}
14 Oct 150258.7DiedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

MicroData Summary for Diego Hurtado de Mendoza y Quiñones (VIAF: 67534655)
Diego Cardinal Hurtado de Mendoza y Quiñones (born 1444, died ) Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuadalajara
Death PlaceMadrid

  • a cardinal for 2.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Mar 1500
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 210, and Page 165
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1470, Number 15*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 5 Nov 2018

Quantcast