Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Philibert Cardinal Hugonet

Deceased

Bishop of Mâcon, France

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo

Bishop of Autun


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Oct 1472AppointedBishop of Mâcon, France
7 May 1473Elevated to Cardinal
17 May 1473AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Lucia in Orphea
17 Aug 1477AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo
10 Jul 1484AppointedBishop of Autun, France
11 Sep 1484DiedBishop of Mâcon, France

MicroData Summary for Philibert Hugonet (VIAF: 74930818)
Philibert Cardinal Hugonet (died ) Bishop of Mâcon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBourgogne
Death PlaceCampo di Fiore, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 11.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 7 May 1473
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 187, and Page 80
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1472, Number 46*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 12 Nov 2018

Quantcast