Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Gaspare Hou (Hu)

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Linqing [Lintsing], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1876Born
20 Apr 190226.1Ordained PriestPriest
30 Mar 193155.1AppointedPrefect of Linqing [Lintsing], China
Oct 194064.6ResignedPrefect of Linqing [Lintsing], China
9 Aug 194569.4DiedPrefect Emeritus of Linqing [Lintsing], China

MicroData Summary for Gaspare Hou (Hu)
Father Gaspare Hou (Hu) (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Linqing [Lintsing]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChe-Eul-Litchoang

  • a priest for 43.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast