Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Henry Howard

Deceased

Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of London District, England

Titular Bishop of Utica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Dec 1684BornWorksop, Nottinghamshire
21 Dec 170925.0Ordained PriestPriest of London District, England, Great Britain
30 Sep 172035.8AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of London District, England, Great Britain
30 Sep 172035.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Utica
11 Nov 172035.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Utica
22 Nov 172035.9DiedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of London District, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Henry Howard:
Father Henry Howard (born , died ) Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of London District

  • a priest for 10.9 years
  • a bishop for .0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 401
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 127

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 11 Nov 2014