Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jodocus Hoetfilter

Deceased

Bishop of Lübeck, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1500Born
153332.9Ordained PriestPriest
26 May 154848.3SelectedBishop of Lübeck, Germany
14 Dec 154848.9ConfirmedBishop of Lübeck, Germany
28 Apr 155151.2DiedBishop of Lübeck, Germany

MicroData Summary for Jodocus Hoetfilter
Bishop Jodocus Hoetfilter (born , died ) Bishop of Lübeck

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOsnabrück

  • a priest for 18.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 228
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1548, Number 34*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast