Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Johannes M. Hoeck (Höck), O.S.B. †

Deceased

Superior General of Order of Saint Benedict

Titular See: (Baviera)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 May 1902Born
6 May 192320.9ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
24 Jul 192725.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
Jul 196159.1AppointedSuperior General of Order of Saint Benedict
197269.6ResignedSuperior General of Order of Saint Benedict
4 Apr 199592.8DiedSuperior General Emeritus of Order of Saint Benedict

MicroData Summary for Johannes M. Hoeck (Höck)
Father Johannes M. Hoeck (Höck) O.S.B. (born , died ) Superior General of Order of Saint Benedict

EventPlace
Birth PlaceInzell, Austria

  • a priest for 67.6 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast