Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Hind

Deceased

Bishop of Roskilde (Roeskilde)


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Mar 1322AppointedBishop of Roskilde (Roeskilde), Denmark
18 Apr 1322Ordained BishopBishop of Roskilde (Roeskilde), Denmark
24 Mar 1330DiedBishop of Roskilde (Roeskilde), Denmark

MicroData Summary for Jean Hind:
Bishop Jean Hind (died ) Bishop of Roskilde (Roeskilde)

  • a bishop for 7.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 423
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Number 9,872

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013