Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Joseph IV (Lazare Timothée) Hindi

Deceased

Patriarch Emeritus of Babylon {Babilonia} (Chaldean)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1726BornAmida
1757¹30.2AppointedArchbishop of Diarbekir (Amida) (Chaldean), Turkey
8 Feb 175730.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Diarbekir (Amida) (Chaldean), Turkey
25 Mar 175932.5ConfirmedPatriarch of Babylon {Babilonia} (Chaldean), Iraq
1781²54.2ResignedPatriarch of Babylon {Babilonia} (Chaldean), Iraq
1791²64.2DiedPatriarch Emeritus of Babylon {Babilonia} (Chaldean), Iraq

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph IV (Lazare Timothée) Hindi:
Patriarch Joseph IV (Lazare Timothée) Hindi (born , died 1791) Patriarch Emeritus of Babylon {Babilonia}

  • a bishop for 33.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1757, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 28 Nov 2015