Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Herrera Suárez, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Tarazona


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Jun 1621AppointedBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
21 Nov 1621Ordained BishopBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
7 Feb 1622SelectedBishop of Tui, Spain
27 Jun 1622ConfirmedBishop of Tui, Spain
2 Dec 1630AppointedBishop of Tarazona, Spain
31 Dec 1631DiedBishop of Tarazona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Herrera Suárez:
Bishop Pedro Herrera Suárez O.P. (died ) Bishop of Tarazona

  • a bishop for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 132, and Page 349
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 338
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 140, Number 895

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015