Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Johann Georg von Herberstein

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Regensburg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Aug 1591Born
28 Feb 166270.5SelectedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
9 Apr 166371.6ConfirmedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
12 Jun 166371.8DiedBishop-Elect of Regensburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Georg von Herberstein
Father Johann Georg von Herberstein (born , died ) Bishop-Elect of Regensburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSalzburg

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast