Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes von Helmont, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Trier

Titular See: Syron


Events

DateEventTitle
1490ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
7 Feb 1508AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany
7 Jul 1508Ordained BishopAuxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany
Jul 1517ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany
9 Nov 1519DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Trier, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johannes von Helmont:
Bishop Johannes von Helmont O.S.B. (died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Trier

  • a bishop for 11.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013