Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Charles Joseph Heitz

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Iles Saint-Pierre et Miquelon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Mar 1861BornMulhouse, France
1 May 188625.1Ordained PriestPriest
9 Nov 192261.6AppointedPrefect of Iles Saint-Pierre et Miquelon
193371.7ResignedPrefect of Iles Saint-Pierre et Miquelon
8 Sep 194483.4DiedPrefect Emeritus of Iles Saint-Pierre et Miquelon

MicroData Summary for Charles Joseph Heitz:
Father Charles Joseph Heitz (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Iles Saint-Pierre et Miquelon

  • a priest for 58.3 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015