Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Joseph Heintz, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Matadi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1865BornBastogne, Belgium
15 Oct 188318.7ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
4 Oct 189126.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
1 Aug 191146.5AppointedPrefect of Matadi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
Feb 1929³64.0ResignedPrefect of Matadi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
29 Aug 194075.6DiedPrefect Emeritus of Matadi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Heintz:
Father Joseph Heintz C.SS.R. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Matadi

  • a priest for 48.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Apostolische Nachfolge
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015