Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Youssef Bin Barbour Assem’ani al Hasrouni

Deceased

Bishop of Tripoli del Libano {Tarabulus} (Maronite)


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Sep 1670Ordained PriestPriest
1675¹AppointedBishop of Tripoli del Libano {Tarabulus} (Maronite)
14 Jul 1675Ordained BishopBishop of Tripoli del Libano {Tarabulus} (Maronite)
11 Dec 1695DiedBishop of Tripoli del Libano {Tarabulus} (Maronite)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Youssef Bin Barbour Assem’ani al Hasrouni:
Bishop Youssef Bin Barbour Assem’ani al Hasrouni (died ) Bishop of Tripoli del Libano {Tarabulus}

  • a priest for 25.2 years
  • a bishop for 20.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,573
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1675, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 11 Apr 2015; Data: 13 Apr 2015