Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Franz Hartz

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Schneidemühl, Poland

Priest of Münster


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jun 1882Born
13 Jun 190825.9Ordained PriestPriest of Münster, Germany
25 Feb 193148.6AppointedPrelate of Schneidemühl, Poland
194562.5ResignedPrelate of Schneidemühl, Poland
15 Feb 195370.6DiedPrelate Emeritus of Schneidemühl, Poland

MicroData Summary for Franz Hartz
Father Franz Hartz (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Schneidemühl

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHüls

  • a priest for 44.6 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018