Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop François Hallé

Deceased

Archbishop of Narbonne, France


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Jul 1482AppointedArchbishop of Narbonne, France
21 Sep 1482Ordained BishopArchbishop of Narbonne, France
23 Feb 1492DiedArchbishop of Narbonne, France

MicroData Summary for François Hallé
Archbishop François Hallé (died ) Archbishop of Narbonne

  • a bishop for 9.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 199
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1482, Number 8
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 88, Number 7,369

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast