Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Kassian Haid, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Abbot of Wettingen-Mehrerau, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Nov 1879Born
17 Sep 189818.8ProfessedMember of Order of Cistercians
24 May 190323.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Cistercians
16 Aug 191737.7SelectedAbbot of Wettingen-Mehrerau, Austria
23 Oct 191737.9ConfirmedAbbot of Wettingen-Mehrerau, Austria
22 Sep 194969.8DiedAbbot of Wettingen-Mehrerau, Austria

MicroData Summary for Kassian Haid
Abbot Kassian Haid O. Cist. (born , died ) Abbot of Wettingen-Mehrerau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceÍtz

  • a priest for 46.3 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018