Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop David Hackett

Deceased

Bishop of Ossory, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Jul 1460SelectedBishop of Ossory, Ireland
14 Jul 1460ConfirmedBishop of Ossory, Ireland
24 Oct 1478DiedBishop of Ossory, Ireland

MicroData Summary for David Hackett
Bishop David Hackett (died ) Bishop of Ossory

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 208
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1460, Number 36*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.0, 30 Aug 2018; Data: 31 Aug 2018

Quantcast