Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Félix Guzmán, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Orihuela, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Aug 1644SelectedBishop of Orihuela, Spain
14 Nov 1644ConfirmedBishop of Orihuela, Spain
1645²Ordained BishopBishop of Orihuela, Spain
1 Mar 1646DiedBishop of Orihuela, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Félix Guzmán
Bishop Félix Guzmán O.P. (died ) Bishop of Orihuela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSevilla, Archdiocese of Sevilla {Seville}

  • a bishop for 1.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 265
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 175, Number 1,089
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1645, Number 63

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast