Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Juan Antonio Guerrero Alves, S.J.

Prefect of the Secretariat for the Economy

Priest of Society of Jesus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1959 Born
10 Oct 197920.4EnteredMember of Society of Jesus
30 May 199233.1Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
14 Nov 201960.5AppointedPrefect of the Secretariat for the Economy

MicroData Summary for Juan Antonio Guerrero Alves
Father Juan Antonio Guerrero Alves S.J. (born ) Prefect of Economy

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMérida, Diocese of Badajoz, Spain

Please contact the Father through the Secretariat for the Economy.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Nov 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast