Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Tommaso Agostino Gubitosa, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot Emeritus of Montevergine, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1914Born
15 Oct 193420.2ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
29 Jun 193924.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
15 Oct 197965.2AppointedAbbot of Montevergine, Italy
25 Jun 198974.9ResignedAbbot of Montevergine, Italy
20 Apr 199782.7DiedAbbot Emeritus of Montevergine, Italy

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Agostino Gubitosa
Abbot Tommaso Agostino Gubitosa O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot Emeritus of Montevergine

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontemiletto

  • a priest for 57.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1981
  • r/d: CB, 3 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jul 2017