Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Diego Gualtiero Rosa, O.S.B.

Abbot of Monte Oliveto Maggiore, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Feb 1953 Born
13 Aug 197219.4ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
8 Sep 197623.5Perpetual VowsMember of Order of Saint Benedict
22 Jun 198027.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
21 Oct 201057.6AppointedAbbot of Monte Oliveto Maggiore, Italy

MicroData Summary for Diego Gualtiero Rosa
Abbot Diego Gualtiero Rosa O.S.B. (born ) Abbot of Monte Oliveto Maggiore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBorgo Poncarale

Please contact the Abbot through the Territorial Abbey of Monte Oliveto Maggiore.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Oct 2010

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast