Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lambert Gruter

Deceased

Bishop of Wiener Neustadt, Austria


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Oct 1574AppointedBishop of Wiener Neustadt, Austria
21 Dec 1574Ordained BishopBishop of Wiener Neustadt, Austria
3 Aug 1582DiedBishop of Wiener Neustadt, Austria

MicroData Summary for Lambert Gruter (VIAF: 198032966)
Bishop Lambert Gruter (died ) Bishop of Wiener Neustadt

  • a bishop for 7.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 169
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1574, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 8 Nov 2017