Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Hermann Grüder

Deceased

Prefect of Denmark


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1828BornSchwerin
14 Jun 185122.8Ordained PriestPriest
9 Jul 186940.8AppointedPrefect of Denmark
15 Dec 188355.3DiedPrefect of Denmark

MicroData Summary for Hermann Grüder:
Father Hermann Grüder (born , died ) Prefect of Denmark

  • a priest for 32.5 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015