Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Thomas Grote

Deceased

Former Bishop-Elect of Lübeck, Germany


Events

DateEventTitle
Nov 1489SelectedBishop of Lübeck, Germany
7 Feb 1490ConfirmedBishop of Lübeck, Germany
27 Feb 1492ResignedBishop-Elect of Lübeck, Germany
27 Aug 1501DiedFormer Bishop-Elect of Lübeck, Germany

MicroData Summary for Thomas Grote
Father Thomas Grote (died ) Former Bishop-Elect of Lübeck

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 180
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1490

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast