Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Gropengeter, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Minden, Germany

Titular Bishop of Banados


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Jan 1499AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Minden, Germany
9 Jan 1499AppointedTitular Bishop of Banados
13 Jan 1499Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Banados
25 Jan 1508ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Minden, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johannes Gropengeter
Bishop Johannes Gropengeter O.S.A. , Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Minden

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSanta Maria del Anima, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 211
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 122, Number 10,946
  • r/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1499, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 8 Jan 2019

Quantcast