Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pál Gregoriancz (Gregorianci)

Deceased

Bishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Jul 1550AppointedBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia
20 Jul 1550Ordained BishopBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia
3 Aug 1554AppointedBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
21 Oct 1565DiedBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary

MicroData Summary for Pál Gregoriancz (Gregorianci)
Bishop Pál Gregoriancz (Gregorianci) (died ) Bishop of Győr (Raab)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceBécs

  • a bishop for 15.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 216, and Page 338
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1550, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 29 Sep 2017