Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Cardinal de Gregorio

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santissima Trinità al Monte Pincio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1729Born
14 Feb 178556.0Elevated to Cardinal
11 Apr 178556.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santissima Trinità al Monte Pincio
11 Jul 179162.4DiedCardinal-Priest of Santissima Trinità al Monte Pincio

MicroData Summary for Giovanni de Gregorio
Giovanni Cardinal de Gregorio (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santissima Trinità al Monte Pincio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMessina, Italy

  • a cardinal for 6.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 14 Feb 1785

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast