Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Antonio Maria (Giovanni Battista) Grandi, B. †

Deceased

Secretary of the Congregation for Extraordinary Ecclesiastical Affairs


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1760Born
29 Oct 177818.3Solemn VowsMember of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
23 Oct 181959.3AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Extraordinary Ecclesiastical Affairs
6 Nov 182262.3DiedSecretary of the Congregation for Extraordinary Ecclesiastical Affairs

MicroData Summary for Antonio Maria (Giovanni Battista) Grandi (VIAF: 88987707)
Father Antonio Maria (Giovanni Battista) Grandi B. (born , died ) Secretary of Extraordinary Ecclesiastical Affairs

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVicenza, Diocese of Vicenza, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Source(s):
  • b/x933: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast