Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franciscus Maria Graffeo, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1633³Born
26 Sep 164916.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
18 Dec 165522.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
30 Apr 168551.6AppointedBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
16 Jan 169561.3DiedBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Franciscus Maria Graffeo
Bishop Franciscus Maria Graffeo O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Bishop of Mazara del Vallo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMazzara

  • a priest for 39.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 261
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1685, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast