Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolás Carlos Gómez de Cervantes y Velázquez de la Cadena

Deceased

Bishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Nov 1668Born
20 Dec 172355.1AppointedBishop of Santiago de Guatemala, Guatemala
20 Feb 172657.3AppointedBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
23 Apr 172758.4InstalledBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
6 Nov 173466.0DiedBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México

MicroData Summary for Nicolás Carlos Gómez de Cervantes y Velázquez de la Cadena
Bishop Nicolás Carlos Gómez de Cervantes y Velázquez de la Cadena (born Nov 1668, died ) Bishop of Guadalajara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Juan de los Reyes

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1726, Number 56
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 214, and Page 216

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast