Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Juste Giusti

Deceased

Bishop of Camerino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jan 1637BornFoligno
20 Aug 168447.6Ordained PriestPriest
9 Apr 168548.2AppointedBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy
23 Nov 169356.8AppointedBishop of Camerino, Italy
6 Apr 170265.2DiedBishop of Camerino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Juste Giusti:
Bishop Francesco Juste Giusti (born , died ) Bishop of Camerino

  • a priest for 17.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 139, and Page 286
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1685, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 25 Apr 2015