Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giulio Giustiniani

Deceased

Bishop of Ajaccio, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1543¹Born
28 Sep 158744.7AppointedBishop of Ajaccio, France
Oct 1587³44.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ajaccio, France
18 Apr 161673.2DiedBishop of Ajaccio, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giulio Giustiniani
Bishop Giulio Giustiniani (born 1543, died ) Bishop of Ajaccio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChio
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceLivorno

  • a bishop for 28.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 94
  • b/c2: AT, 21 Aug 2016
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 18,960
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1587, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018