Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacinto Giustiniani, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Syros (e Milos)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1711¹BornChios
15 May 175241.3AppointedBishop of Syros (e Milos), Greece
29 May 178675.4ResignedBishop of Syros (e Milos), Greece
1 Jan 179584.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Syros (e Milos), Greece

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Giacinto Giustiniani:
Bishop Giacinto Giustiniani O.P. (born 1711, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Syros (e Milos)

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 390
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1752, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015