Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Angelo Cardinal Giori

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Quirico e Giulitta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 May 1586BornCapodacqua, Italy
13 Jul 164357.1Elevated to Cardinal
13 Jul 164357.1Ordained PriestPriest
31 Aug 164357.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Quirico e Giulitta
8 Aug 166276.2DiedCardinal-Priest of Santi Quirico e Giulitta

MicroData Summary for Angelo Giori:
Angelo Cardinal Giori (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santi Quirico e Giulitta

  • a priest for 19.0 years
  • a cardinal for 19.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 13 Jul 1643

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015