Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Thomas Gillow

Deceased

Priest


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1769BornSingleton
1 Apr 179727.4Ordained PriestPriest
17 Mar 181848.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Trinidad, Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles
17 Mar 181848.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Hypsus
19 Mar 185787.3DiedPriest

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Thomas Gillow:
Priest Thomas Gillow (born , died ) Priest of (unknown)

  • a priest for 60.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 217
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Pio IX (Gams), Page 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013