Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gilles

Deceased

Bishop of Osma


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Mar 1247AppointedBishop of Osma, Spain
7 Apr 1247Ordained BishopBishop of Osma, Spain
4 Aug 1261DiedBishop of Osma, Spain

MicroData Summary for Gilles :
Bishop Gilles (died ) Bishop of Osma

  • a bishop for 14.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 383
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Number 9,079

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 4 Jan 2014