Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father François-Charles-Marie Gillard

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Constantine (-Hippone), Algeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Apr 1839Born
19 Dec 186324.6Ordained PriestPriest
27 Feb 188040.8AppointedBishop of Constantine (-Hippone), Algeria
29 Sep 188041.4DiedBishop-Elect of Constantine (-Hippone), Algeria

MicroData Summary for François-Charles-Marie Gillard
Father François-Charles-Marie Gillard (born , died ) Bishop-Elect of Constantine (-Hippone)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQuimperlé

  • a priest for 16.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 223
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1880

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast