Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Paolo Giannini, O.S.B.I. †

Deceased

Abbot Emeritus of Santa Maria di Grottaferrata (Italo-Albanese), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jul 1920Born
31 Oct 193515.3EnteredMember of Ordine Basiliano Italiano di Grottaferrata
2 Feb 193817.5Temporary VowsMember of Ordine Basiliano Italiano di Grottaferrata
11 Nov 194121.3Solemn VowsMember of Ordine Basiliano Italiano di Grottaferrata
15 Aug 194222.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Ordine Basiliano Italiano di Grottaferrata
21 Nov 194323.3Ordained PriestPriest of Ordine Basiliano Italiano di Grottaferrata
1 Aug 197252.0SelectedAbbot of Santa Maria di Grottaferrata (Italo-Albanese), Italy
4 Aug 197252.0ConfirmedAbbot of Santa Maria di Grottaferrata (Italo-Albanese), Italy
28 Jul 199070.0ConfirmedAbbot of Santa Maria di Grottaferrata (Italo-Albanese), Italy
1994²73.4ResignedAbbot of Santa Maria di Grottaferrata (Italo-Albanese), Italy
21 Jul 200686.0DiedAbbot Emeritus of Santa Maria di Grottaferrata (Italo-Albanese), Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paolo Giannini
Abbot Paolo Giannini O.S.B.I. (born , died ) Abbot Emeritus of Santa Maria di Grottaferrata

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlbano Laziale, Suburbicarian See of Albano
Death PlaceSanta Maria di Grottaferrata, Abbey, Grottaferrata, Territorial Abbey of Santa Maria di Grottaferrata (Italo-Albanese)

  • a priest for 62.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 7 Jan 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 9 Jan 2019

Quantcast