Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jón Gerreksson

Deceased

Bishop of Skálholt, Iceland


Events

DateEventTitle
28 Jul 1410AppointedArchbishop of Uppsala, Sweden
1422¹ResignedArchbishop of Uppsala, Sweden
6 Mar 1426AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Skálholt, Iceland
18 Jul 1433DiedBishop of Skálholt, Iceland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jón Gerreksson (VIAF: 71376674)
Archbishop Jón Gerreksson (died ) Bishop of Skálholt

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 455, and Page 508

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 27 Nov 2018

Quantcast