Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop László Geréb

Deceased

Archbishop of Kalocsa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1452¹Born
25 Sep 147624.7AppointedBishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania
14 Feb 150250.1AppointedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary
11 Dec 150351.9DiedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for László Geréb:
Archbishop László Geréb (born 1452, died ) Archbishop of Kalocsa

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 132, and Page 254

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015