Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Otto von Gemmingen

Deceased

Bishop of Augsburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1545BornMühlhausen
158135.2Ordained PriestPriest of Augsburg, Germany
21 Mar 159145.4SelectedBishop of Augsburg, Germany
10 May 159145.5ConfirmedBishop of Augsburg, Germany
25 Aug 159145.8Ordained BishopBishop of Augsburg, Germany
6 Oct 159853.0DiedBishop of Augsburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Otto von Gemmingen:
Bishop Johann Otto von Gemmingen (born , died ) Bishop of Augsburg

  • a priest for 17.8 years
  • a bishop for 7.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013