Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Siegfried von Gelnhausen

Deceased

Bishop of Chur, Switzerland


Events

DateEventTitle
Nov 1298³Ordained DeaconDeacon
Nov 1298³Ordained PriestPriest
20 Nov 1298AppointedBishop of Chur, Switzerland
Dec 1298³Ordained BishopBishop of Chur, Switzerland
19 Jul 1321DiedBishop of Chur, Switzerland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Siegfried von Gelnhausen
Bishop Siegfried von Gelnhausen (died ) Bishop of Chur

EventPlace
Death PlaceChur, Diocese of Chur

  • a priest for 22.7 years
  • a bishop for 22.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 16 Jan 2020
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 219

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast