Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Diego Gelmírez

Deceased

Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1070¹Born
1 Jul 110030.5AppointedBishop of Compostela, Spain
21 Apr 110131.3Ordained BishopBishop of Compostela, Spain
27 Feb 112050.1AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
15 Jan 114070.0DiedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Diego Gelmírez
Archbishop Diego Gelmírez (born 1070, died ) Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela

  • a bishop for 38.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 288, Number 26
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Number 9,938

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast