Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Luigi Cardinal Gazzoli

Deceased

Priest of the Roman Curia - Other

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1774BornTerni, Italy
30 Sep 183157.5Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
2 Jul 183258.3Elevated to Cardinal
2 Jul 183258.3AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio
19 Mar 185783.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata
12 Feb 185883.9DiedPriest of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Luigi Gazzoli:
Cardinal Luigi Gazzoli (born , died ) Priest of Roman Curia - Other

  • a cardinal for 26.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013